*******7776
04/07/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Contract - Insurance
Los Angeles, California
DANIEL S. MURPHY
GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION
STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
GOLDSTEIN JASON EDWARD
4/7/2023: Complaint
4/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
4/7/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
4/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
4/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
4/7/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING
4/7/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET
4/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
5/30/2023: Request for Judicial Notice
5/30/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
5/30/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME O
5/31/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION
5/31/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service
6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service
6/1/2023: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION
6/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF IT...)
Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/31/2023; Service Cost: 143.55; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/31/2023; Service Cost: 83.55; Service Cost Waived: No
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Ruling RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketStatus Conference re Underlying Case scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF IT...)
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 06/01/2023; Result Type to Held
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/01/2023
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less