This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2023 at 03:06:14 (UTC).

GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING, CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2023 GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING, CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7776

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

STEWART TITLE GUARANTY COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION

STEWART TITLE OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN JASON EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/7/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

4/7/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/7/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

4/7/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/11/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Request for Judicial Notice

5/30/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

5/30/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION

5/30/2023: Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application PLAINTIFF GRAND PACIFIC FINANCING CORPORATIONS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION

Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Ex Parte Application

5/31/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Notice of Non-Opposition to Ex Parte Application

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/31/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling Notice of Ruling RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION

6/1/2023: Notice of Ruling Notice of Ruling RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF IT...)

6/1/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF IT...)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/26/2024

Hearing02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Entire Action/Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/31/2023; Service Cost: 143.55; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/31/2023; Service Cost: 83.55; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketStatus Conference re Underlying Case scheduled for 02/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF IT...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 updated: Result Date to 06/01/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY THE PROSECUTION OF ITS COMPLAINT AND THIS ACTION, PENDING THE ULTIMATE OUTCOME OF THE UNDERLYING ACTION scheduled for 06/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
04/11/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Grand Pacific Financing, Corporation, a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Stewart Title of California, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Stewart Title Guaranty Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less