This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 07:46:15 (UTC).

DONNA LEE SCOULAR VS EARL MENDES HYMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/30/2023 DONNA LEE SCOULAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EARL MENDES HYMAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1712

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOULAR DONNA LEE

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

HYMAN EARL MENDES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSMAN ESQ ROBERT S

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS PATRICK JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/30/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

5/30/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/30/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/30/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/30/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/30/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/30/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/12/2023: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

7/20/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

7/20/2023: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/20/2023: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant); As to: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff); As to: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/08/2023; Service Cost: 110.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL - Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk; As to: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff); As to: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. NEGLIGENCE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff); As to: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: DONNA LEE SCOULAR (Plaintiff); As to: EARL MENDES HYMAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less