This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2023 at 21:30:35 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FUMIKO WASSERMAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0082

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FUMIKO WASSERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Respondent

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LLOYD PRISCILLA

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition - PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENTS

5/11/2023: Petition - PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/11/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE _946.6

6/6/2023: Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE _946.6

Proof of Personal Service

6/6/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6

6/15/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION RESPONDENT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6

6/21/2023: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T ...)

6/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T ...)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition for Relief from Claim Requirement, GOV'T ...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Relief from Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6 scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 06/29/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition for Relief from Claim Requirements: Filed By: Insurance Company of the West (Petitioner); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Notice of Hearing on Petition For Relief From Claim Requirements, GOV'T Code 946.6: Name Extension changed from AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE _946.6 to For Relief From Claim Requirements, GOV'T Code 946.6 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Opposition To Petition For Relief From Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6: Name Extension changed from RESPONDENT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6 to To Petition For Relief From Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Reply To Opposition To Petition For Relief From Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6: Name Extension changed from TO OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6 to To Opposition To Petition For Relief From Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketReply TO OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketOpposition RESPONDENT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR RELIEF FROM CLAIM REQUIREMENT, GOV'T CODE 946.6; Filed by: County of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Relief from Claim Requirement, GOV'T Code 946.6 scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Petitioner); As to: County of Los Angeles (Respondent); Service Date: 06/02/2023; Service Cost: 175.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Fumiko Wasserman in Department B Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketPetition for Relief from Claim Requirements; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Petitioner); As to: County of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Insurance Company of the West (Petitioner); As to: County of Los Angeles (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less