This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2023 at 18:00:29 (UTC).

ANTHONY WILLIAMS VS PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 ANTHONY WILLIAMS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1983

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS ANTHONY

Defendants

BLP STAFFING SOLUTIONS LLC

HYATT CORPORATION

HYATT HOTELS CORPORATION

PERALTA JOSE

PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC

PRISM HOSPITALITY L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINGS SCOTT O. ESQ.

FRANCK LEE K. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CLAXTON LINDA

CHANG CHLOE SUH-YON

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

10/31/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice (name extension) Notice Signed Joint Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint

10/26/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Signed Joint Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Grant Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint

10/25/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Grant Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...)

10/25/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...)

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st) (2nd)

10/25/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st) (2nd)

Case Management Statement

10/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

10/17/2023: Answer

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Lee Franck In Anticipation of the October 25, 2023, Order to Appear

10/16/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Lee Franck In Anticipation of the October 25, 2023, Order to Appear

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/9/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Notice (name extension) Notice OF PROCEEDINGS

10/4/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF PROCEEDINGS

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

9/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

Answer

9/26/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/4/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE SERVING PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.40 AND 416.10

7/26/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE SERVING PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP, LLC VIA CERTIFIED MAIL, PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 415.40 AND 416.10

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/11/2023

Hearing12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2023

Hearing12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant); Hyatt Corporation (Defendant); Jose Peralta (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketNotice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketNotice Signed Joint Stipulation Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint; Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketAmended Complaint (1st) (2nd); Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for entry of default; Case ...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketStipulation and Order to Grant Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint; Signed and Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Grant Plaintiff Leave to File a First Amended Complaint: Filed By: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 10/25/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
06/02/2023

DocketAddress for Scott O. Cummings, Esq. (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anthony Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less