This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2023 at 14:29:03 (UTC).

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY VS HUGO OCHOA SANDOVAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HUGO OCHOA SANDOVAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2153

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GANAHL LUMBER COMPANY

Defendants

AFZALI NADER M

SANDOVAL HUGO OCHOA DBA 8A GENERAL CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FILER NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/18/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/18/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/18/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/18/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

02/06/2024

Hearing02/06/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/06/2024 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ochoa Sandoval (Defendant); Nader M Afzali (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ochoa Sandoval (Defendant); Nader M Afzali (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ganahl Lumber Company (Plaintiff); As to: Hugo Ochoa Sandoval (Defendant); Nader M Afzali (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less