This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2023 at 00:30:05 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS PUSH INTERACTIVE, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2023 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PUSH INTERACTIVE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9544

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

PUSH INTERACTIVE LLC AKA PUSH INTERACTIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JYOO JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/15/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/15/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/15/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/15/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

12/08/2023

Hearing12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketAddress for Joseph Jyoo (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketAddress for Joseph Jyoo (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: PUSH INTERACTIVE, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: PUSH INTERACTIVE, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: PUSH INTERACTIVE, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less