This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/02/2023 at 18:07:16 (UTC).

BAROMANDAN, HAIEDEH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 07/07/2023 BAROMANDAN, HAIEDEH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAY, GUS T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7421

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAY, GUS T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BAHRAMIAN JENNIFER G.

Decedent

BAROMANDAN HAIEDEH

Not Classified By Court

ELLIS STEPHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DELANEY STEPHANIE KATHLEEN

GRECO DAVID GERALD

 

Court Documents

Order - Probate Corrected

10/20/2023: Order - Probate Corrected

Letters - Amended

10/20/2023: Letters - Amended

Minute Order

10/17/2023: Minute Order

Supplement Supplement to Clear Probate Notes re Order to Show Cause re Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued

10/11/2023: Supplement Supplement to Clear Probate Notes re Order to Show Cause re Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued

Ex Parte - Order

10/5/2023: Ex Parte - Order

Notice - Administration to Creditors

10/5/2023: Notice - Administration to Creditors

Notice - Proposed Action Consent to Notice of Proposed Action

10/5/2023: Notice - Proposed Action Consent to Notice of Proposed Action

Notice Notice of Death to Franchise Tax Board

10/5/2023: Notice Notice of Death to Franchise Tax Board

Notice Notice of Death to Director of Health Care Services

10/5/2023: Notice Notice of Death to Director of Health Care Services

Inventory & Appraisal Reappraisal for Sale- $700,000.00

10/5/2023: Inventory & Appraisal Reappraisal for Sale- $700,000.00

Inventory & Appraisal Final $715,000.00

10/5/2023: Inventory & Appraisal Final $715,000.00

Ex Parte - Order

9/29/2023: Ex Parte - Order

Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order

9/27/2023: Ex Parte - Application Nunc Pro Tunc Order

Proof of Publication

9/26/2023: Proof of Publication

Notice - Proposed Action

9/20/2023: Notice - Proposed Action

Notice - Proposed Action Notice of Proposed Action

9/11/2023: Notice - Proposed Action Notice of Proposed Action

Proof of Service Proof of Service by Mail

9/11/2023: Proof of Service Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service Proof of Service by E-Service

9/11/2023: Proof of Service Proof of Service by E-Service

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/17/2025

Hearing01/17/2025 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 2D at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketLetters - Amended; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketOrder - Probate (Corrected ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

Docketin Probate Department 2D, May, Gus T., Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketSupplement (Supplement to Clear Probate Notes re Order to Show Cause re Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketNotice - Proposed Action (Consent to Notice of Proposed Action ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors (Notice - Administration to Creditors ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
07/19/2023

DocketLetters - Special Administrator; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2023

DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketOrder - Appointing Special Administrator

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) (Letters Of Special Administration Without General Power ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketDeclaration (REe Notice in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Special Letters of Administration without General Powers ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketEx Parte - Proposed Order - Appointing Special Administrator; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketDeclaration of Urgency (Of Jennifer Bahramian re Urgency in Support of Ex Parte Petition for Special Letters of Administration without General Powers ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less