This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2023 at 09:06:55 (UTC).

JARMUS, MARK - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 JARMUS, MARK - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4506

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS CHERYL

Claimants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A

RMO LLP

Decedent

JARMUS MARK

Interested Party

BORDEN ALEX R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEBOWSKY LAWRENCE MICHAEL

Claimant Attorney

GRECO DAVID GERALD

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Declaration And Supporting Points And Authorities For Petition For Appointment Of Co-Special Administrators

4/25/2023: Declaration - Ex Parte Declaration And Supporting Points And Authorities For Petition For Appointment Of Co-Special Administrators

Consent - To Serve

4/25/2023: Consent - To Serve

Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration

4/25/2023: Ex Parte - Petition - Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Creditor's Claim

5/23/2023: Creditor's Claim

Ex Parte - Order

5/25/2023: Ex Parte - Order

Bond - -US Specialty

6/27/2023: Bond - -US Specialty

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/3/2023: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Letters - Special Administrator

7/5/2023: Letters - Special Administrator

Creditor's Claim - $411,611.46 RMO LLP

7/26/2023: Creditor's Claim - $411,611.46 RMO LLP

Proof of Service - Proof of Service re Creditor's Claim by RMO LLP

7/28/2023: Proof of Service - Proof of Service re Creditor's Claim by RMO LLP

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service re Creditor's Claim by RMO LLP ); Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketCreditor's Claim ($411,611.46 RMO LLP ); Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketLetters - Special Administrator; Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketBond (-US Specialty ); Filed by Interested Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketConsent (To Serve ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketDeclaration (Ex Parte Declaration And Supporting Points And Authorities For Petition For Appointment Of Co-Special Administrators ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less