This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 18:17:04 (UTC).

JARMUS, MARK - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/25/2023 JARMUS, MARK - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4506

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTIAN, DEBORAH L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MORRIS CHERYL

Claimants

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK N.A

RMO LLP

Decedent

JARMUS MARK

Interested Party

BORDEN ALEX R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEBOWSKY LAWRENCE MICHAEL

Claimant Attorneys

MUNTZ SEAN DAVID

SZACHOWICZ PHILLIP JOHN

GRECO DAVID GERALD

 

Court Documents

Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate (DE-150) (Letters)

11/20/2023: Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate (DE-150) (Letters)

Order - Probate

11/17/2023: Order - Probate

Bond -US Specialty

11/2/2023: Bond -US Specialty

Minute Order

10/31/2023: Minute Order

Supplement Supplement To Petition for Letters of Administration

10/26/2023: Supplement Supplement To Petition for Letters of Administration

Consent Consent to Act as Personal Representative

10/26/2023: Consent Consent to Act as Personal Representative

Proof of Publication

10/17/2023: Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate 10/31/2023

10/6/2023: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate 10/31/2023

Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

9/26/2023: Petition - Letters of Administration (Subsequent)

Proof of Service Proof of Service re Creditor's Claim by RMO LLP

7/28/2023: Proof of Service Proof of Service re Creditor's Claim by RMO LLP

Creditor's Claim $411,611.46 RMO LLP

7/26/2023: Creditor's Claim $411,611.46 RMO LLP

Letters - Special Administrator

7/5/2023: Letters - Special Administrator

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

7/3/2023: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Bond -US Specialty

6/27/2023: Bond -US Specialty

Ex Parte - Order

5/25/2023: Ex Parte - Order

Creditor's Claim

5/23/2023: Creditor's Claim

Ex Parte - Petition Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration

4/25/2023: Ex Parte - Petition Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration

Consent To Serve

4/25/2023: Consent To Serve

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/25/2025

Hearing03/25/2025 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service Re: Creditor's Claim ); Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketLetters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate (Letters (Initial) - Decedent's Estate (DE-150) (Letters) ); Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2023

DocketOrder - Probate; Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketBond (-US Specialty ); Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

Docketin Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketPetition Granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketConsent (Consent to Act as Personal Representative ); Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
07/26/2023

DocketCreditor's Claim ($411,611.46 RMO LLP ); Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

DocketLetters - Special Administrator; Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/03/2023

DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketBond (-US Specialty ); Filed by Interested Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketEx Parte - Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketDeclaration (Ex Parte Declaration And Supporting Points And Authorities For Petition For Appointment Of Co-Special Administrators ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketEx Parte - Petition (Ex Parte Petition for Letters of Special Administration ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

DocketConsent (To Serve ); Filed by Attorney

[+] Read More [-] Read Less