This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2023 at 11:14:59 (UTC).

HARRY HERBERT SURTEES VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 HARRY HERBERT SURTEES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0737

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M COMPANY

AMCORD INC.

CATERPILLAR INC.

CONAIR LLC OF CA

CROWN LABORATORIES DBA DESENEX

DAP INC.

DCO LLC F/K/A DANA COMPANIES LLC F/K/A DANA CORPORATION. FKA DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

DEERE & COMPANY

EDELBROCK LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA AUTO PARTS

GOODRICH CORPORATION

HENRY COMPANY LLC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

JM MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC. DBA JM PIPE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

JONES AND JONES CONSTRUCTION

MCCORD CORPORATION FKA MCCORD GASKET CORPORATION

MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

PFIZER INC.

PHILLIPS ELECTRONICS NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JAMISON KEVIN D.

KEMPEN DAVID W.

LIN CARRIE S

FOLEY PATRICK J.

DUFFY JOSEPH

TABUENA CYRIAN B

TRAN RONALD

SMELSER STEVEN D.

CORMIER JENNIFER A

CUNNINGHAM JAMES P

LASHINSKY NATALIE G.

MCGAH SEAN CHRISTOPHER

DI SAIA STEVEN

PEATMAN STEPHANIE

SCHATZ RUSSELL W.

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

BOWLBY STEPHANIE LYN

BUGATTO ROBERT J.

Other Attorneys

HUANG AILEEN

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/14/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT F...)

7/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT F...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HARRY SURTEES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

7/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HARRY SURTEES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

Joinder - THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL PRESERVATION DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF HARRY SURTEES

7/13/2023: Joinder - THE W.W. HENRY COMPANY, L.P.S JOINDER TO DEFENDANT PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TRIAL PRESERVATION DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF HARRY SURTEES

Motion for Trial Preference - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING

7/13/2023: Motion for Trial Preference - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENTIAL TRIAL SETTING

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

7/13/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC BROWN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/12/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Answer - DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

7/12/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

Answer - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

7/12/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY ASBESTOS; REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/12/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

7/12/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT THE SHERWIN-WILLIAMS COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES

Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/10/2023: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT DAP, INC. K/N/A LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

7/5/2023: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLCS MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/5/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer - DEFENDANT KOMATSU AMERICA CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/30/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT KOMATSU AMERICA CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

86 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2023
  • Hearing11/08/2023 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: The W.W. Henry Company (Defendant); As to: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Motion for Order Granting Preferential Trial Setting; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Harry Surtees in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preference; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Eric Brown in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preference; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketThe W.W. Henry Company, L.P.s Joinder to Defendant PPG Industries, Inc.s Objections to Plaintiffs Amended Notice of Trial Preservation Deposition of Plaintiff Harry Surtees; Filed by: The W.W. Henry Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint f...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction for Specially Appearing Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC (Surtees-23STCV10737) scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 15 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/25/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Union Carbide Corporation (Doe 1) (Defendant); As to: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: Union Carbide Corporation (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: The Sherwin Williams Company (Doe 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: Komatsu America Corp. (Doe 4) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); Caterpillar, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); Caterpillar, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harry Herbert Surtees (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); Caterpillar, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 23STCV10737 Hearing Date: July 13, 2023 Dept: 15

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTIONS TO QUASH

Plaintiff Harry Surtees filed this action alleging he was exposed to asbestos in talc supplied by Defendant Vanderbilt Mineral, LLC, Inc. Defendant filed a motion to quash service of summons for lack of personal jurisdiction.

A defendant may move to quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (a)(1).) The court may dismiss without prejudice the complaint in whole, or as to that defendant, when dismissal is made pursuant to Section 418.10. (Code Civ. Proc., 581, subd. (h).)

“A court of this state may exercise jurisdiction on any basis not inconsistent with the Constitution of this state or of the United States.” (Code Civ. Proc., 410.10.) “The Due Process Clause protects an individual’s liberty interest in not being subject to the binding judgments of a forum with which he has established no meaningful ‘contacts, ties, or relations.’” (Burger King Corp. v. Rudzewicz (1985) 471 U.S. 462, 471-472.) A state court may not exercise personal jurisdiction over a party under circumstances that would offend “traditional notions of fair play and substantial justice.” (Asahi Metal Industry Co., Ltd., v. Superior Court of California, Solano County (1987) 480 U.S. 102, 113.)

When a defendant moves to quash service of process on jurisdictional grounds, the plaintiff has the initial burden of demonstrating facts justifying the exercise of jurisdiction. (Jayone Foods, Inc. v. Aekyung Industrial Co. Ltd. (2019) 31 Cal.App.5th 543, 553.) Once facts showing minimum contacts with the forum state are established, the defendant has the burden to demonstrate that the exercise of jurisdiction would be unreasonable. (Ibid.) “The plaintiff must provide specific evidentiary facts, through affidavits and other authenticated documents, sufficient to allow the court to independently conclude whether jurisdiction is appropriate. [Citation.] The plaintiff cannot rely on allegations in an unverified complaint or vague and conclusory assertions of ultimate facts. [Citation.]” (Strasner v. Touchstone Wireless Repair & Logistics, LP (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 215, 222.)

A defendant is subject to a state’s general jurisdiction if its contacts “are so continuance and systematic as to render [it] essentially at home in the forum State.” (Saimler AG v. Bauman (2014) 571 U.S. 117, 127.) A nonresident defendant may be subject to the specific jurisdiction of the forum “if the defendant has purposefully availed himself or herself of forum benefits [citation], and the ‘controversy is related to or “arises out of” a defendant’s contacts with the forum.’ [Citations.]” (Vons Companies, Inc. v. Seabest Foods, Inc. (1996) 14 Cal.4th 434, 446.) This test does not require a “causal relationship between the defendant’s in-state activity and the litigation.” (Ford Motor Co. v. Montana Eighth Judicial District Court (2021) 141 S.Ct. 1017, 1026.) The “arise out” of standard “asks about causation,” but “relate to” does not. (Ibid.) “[W]hen a corporation has ‘continuously and deliberately exploited [a State’s] market, it must reasonably anticipate being haled into [that State’s] court[s]’ to defend actions ‘based on’ products causing injury there.” (Id. at p. 1027.)

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC provided evidence that it is incorporated in Delaware and has its principal place of business in Connecticut (Stewart Decl., 2), and therefore it is not a resident of California and not subject to its general jurisdiction.

Defendant argues it is not subject to California’s specific jurisdiction unless Plaintiffs can prove Karen McGee was exposed to asbestos in a product in California that contained Defendant’s talc. (Motion at p. 4.) Defendant argues the complaint does not allege the specific products at issue. (Ibid.) Defendant does not contend that it has not sold or shipped talc to California. It does not contend that it has not continuously and deliberately exploited California’s market.

Defendant is correct that the complaint provides no information about the specific products at issue. Only in his opposition does Plaintiff identify the products – unspecified DAP construction and caulk products. (Opposition at p. 2.) Plaintiff argues Defendant assumed the liability of R.T. Vanderbilt Company, which had a talc mine and sales office in California. (Opposition at pp. 2-3; Eyerly Decl., Ex. B at pp. 39-40; Ex. E at p. 1430.) According to Plaintiff, the talc contained asbestos. (Eyerly Decl., Ex. C at p. 126.) R.T. Vanderbilt Company was registered with the California Secretary of State. (Eyerly Decl., Ex. F.) R.T. Vanderbilt Company supplied talc to DAP. (Eyerly Decl., Ex. G at pp. 162-163.

Vanderbilt Minerals acknowledges that it is the successor to R.T. Vanderbilt Company. (Reply at p. 2.) Thus, Plaintiff has established that Defendant’s predecessor R.T. Vanderbilt Company continuously and deliberately exploited California’s market by having a mine and sales office in California.

Plaintiff requests jurisdictional discovery to obtain evidence that Defendant’s talc was in the DAP products that Plaintiff used. The motion is CONTINUED to October 25, 2023 at 9 a.m. for jurisdictional discovery on that issue. Plaintiff may file a supplemental opposition and Defendant may file a supplemental reply on regular notice.

The moving party is to give notice.