This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 08:08:44 (UTC).

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC VS 5477 ALHAMBRA AVE LA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/10/2023 FERGUSON ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 5477 ALHAMBRA AVE LA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6115

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FERGUSON ENTERPRISES LLC

Defendant

5477 ALHAMBRA AVE LA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SYKULSKI DANA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/10/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/10/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/10/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/10/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/10/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/15/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT) RE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

8/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

11/29/2023

Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 72.50; Service Date: 07/13/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) RE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketUpdated -- 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC, a limited liability company to 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketAddress for Dana Sykulski (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ferguson Enterprises, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: 5477 Alhambra Ave LA, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/10/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less