This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2023 at 16:02:44 (UTC).

KATHLEEN HILAND, ET AL. VS 3M COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2023 KATHLEEN HILAND, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8396

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILAND JOHN

Defendants

3M COMPANY

ACTUANT CORPORATION

AKZO NOBEL PAINTS LLC

ARVINMERITOR INC.

BASF CATALYSTS LLC

CARLISLE INDUSTRIAL BRAKE & FRICTION INC. FKA MOTION CONTROL INDUSTRIES INC.

CLINIQUE LABORATORIES LLC

CURTISS-WRIGHT FLOW CONTROL CORPORATION

CYTEC INDUSTRIES INC.

DAP INC.

DCO LLC FKA DANA COMPANIES LLC FKA DANA CORPORATION

DUNN-EDWARDS CORPORATION

EATON AEROQUIP LLC

FEDERAL MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY AKA NAPA AUTO PARTS

GOODRICH CORPORATION

HENKEL CORPORATION

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG AILEEN

Defendant Attorneys

MCGLYNN MAUREEN A.

SCADDEN JAMES G.

CASOLARI CARISSA A

KARREN BRENT

LASHINSKY NATALIE GARCIA

BAILEY BOBBIE R.

BEAL HOLLY C.

COSGROVE RYAN E.

SMELSER STEVEN D.

SPANGLER VIIU

WILSON LANCE D

WOOD JULIA

BARAVARIAN TINA L.

BARONIAN ROBERT HAIG

BERGSTROM EMILY DIANE

BOWLBY STEPHANIE L.

DUFFY JOSEPH

JACKSON GABRIEL A.

29 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

11/29/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Motion Compelling Clinique Laboratories LLC to Provide Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Special Interrogatories, Set One

11/29/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Motion Compelling Clinique Laboratories LLC to Provide Further Responses to Plaintiffs' Special Interrogatories, Set One

Ex Parte Application (name extension) Plaintiffs’ Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing Plaintiffs’ November 30, 2023 Motion To Compel Further Responses From Clinique Laboratories LLC To A Later Date; [Proposed] Stipulation And Order

11/28/2023: Ex Parte Application (name extension) Plaintiffs’ Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing Plaintiffs’ November 30, 2023 Motion To Compel Further Responses From Clinique Laboratories LLC To A Later Date; [Proposed] Stipulation And Order

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/28/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

11/28/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) Notice Of Court's Order Continuing Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Compelling The Boeing Company To Further Respond To Plaintiffs' Laosd General Order Standard Interrogatories

11/27/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Of Court's Order Continuing Plaintiffs' Motion For An Order Compelling The Boeing Company To Further Respond To Plaintiffs' Laosd General Order Standard Interrogatories

Reply (name extension) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for An Order Compelling the Boeing Company to Further Respond to Plaintiffs' LAOSD General Order Standard Interrogatories; Declaration of Michael Eyerly

11/27/2023: Reply (name extension) Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for An Order Compelling the Boeing Company to Further Respond to Plaintiffs' LAOSD General Order Standard Interrogatories; Declaration of Michael Eyerly

Request for Dismissal

11/21/2023: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Summary Adjudication Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

11/22/2023: Motion for Summary Adjudication Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of James M. Buck in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

11/22/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of James M. Buck in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Separate Statement Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

11/22/2023: Separate Statement Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

11/22/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Exhibit List Index of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

11/22/2023: Exhibit List Index of Exhibits in Support of Defendant Amcord, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication of Issues

Substitution of Attorney

11/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel The Boeing Company to Further Res...)

11/21/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel The Boeing Company to Further Res...)

Notice (name extension) Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.'s List of Former Testimony

11/20/2023: Notice (name extension) Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc.'s List of Former Testimony

Notice (name extension) Defendant Morse Tec LLC's List of Former Tesitmony

11/20/2023: Notice (name extension) Defendant Morse Tec LLC's List of Former Tesitmony

Opposition (name extension) Defendant Ppg Architectural Finishes, Inc.’s Opposition To Motion To Compel Further Responses To Set One Specially Prepared Interrogatories

11/17/2023: Opposition (name extension) Defendant Ppg Architectural Finishes, Inc.’s Opposition To Motion To Compel Further Responses To Set One Specially Prepared Interrogatories

288 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/29/2024

Hearing05/29/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/22/2024

Hearing01/22/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2024

Hearing01/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/2024

Hearing01/08/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2023

Hearing12/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2023

Hearing12/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Clinique Laboratories LLC to Provide Further Responses to Plaintiff's Special Interrogatories, Set One (HILAND-23STCV08396)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2023

Hearing12/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2023

Hearing12/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Order Compelling Defendant PPG Architectural Finishes Inc. to Further Respond to Plaintiffs' Specially Prepared Interrogatories, Set One (Hiland-23STCV08396)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2023

Hearing12/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel The Boeing Company to Further Respond to Plaintiff's LAOSD General Order Standard Interrogatories (HILAND-23STCV08396)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2023

Hearing12/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing - Other on Verified Application to Permit Spencer D. Wein As Counsel Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Defendant BASF Corporation (Hiland-23STCV08396)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
393 More Docket Entries
04/28/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2023

DocketPlaintiffs Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by: Kathleen Hiland (Plaintiff); John Hiland (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketUpdated -- Morse Tec LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Morse Tec LLC, f/k/a Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation to Morse Tec LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketUpdated -- Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne, Inc. aka United Technologies to Pratt & Whitney Rocketdyne, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kathleen Hiland (Plaintiff); John Hiland (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Actuant Corporation (Defendant); Akzo Nobel Paints LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kathleen Hiland (Plaintiff); John Hiland (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Actuant Corporation (Defendant); Akzo Nobel Paints LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kathleen Hiland (Plaintiff); John Hiland (Plaintiff); As to: 3M Company (Defendant); Actuant Corporation (Defendant); Akzo Nobel Paints LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******8396 Hearing Date: November 16, 2023 Dept: 15

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND DOCUMENTS (BOEING)

Plaintiffs Kathleen Hiland and John Hiland served a PMK deposition notice including requests for documents on Defendant The Boeing Company. Defendant served objections.

The court rules as follows:

Request Nos. 1, 3, 4, 5, 9: Denied. These request seeks all information related to asbestos on Defendant's aircraft at any time, as well as all reports, studies, and memos about asbestos on Defendant's aircraft, information about handling asbestos-containing materials, correspondence about asbestos, and the sources of all asbestos products on Defendant's aircraft at any time. These requests are overbroad and seek irrelevant information. For example, they are not limited to the airlines for whom Plaintiff's father worked, the type of planes Plaintiff's father worked on, the type of work he did, or the time period he worked on planes. They would require Defendant to search records from the beginning of its existence and located throughout the world for all aircraft it sold anywhere in the world.

Request No. 2: Denied. This request seeks all information about aircraft sold to Continental before 2010. This request is extremely overbroad and seeks information not reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. For example, it would require the production of information about thousands (if not tens of thousands) of parts of planes not at issue here.

Request No. 6: Denied. This request seeks all information about contracts and related documents for all aircraft Defendant sold to Continental before 2010. This request would require the production of information about the negotiations for all sales of aircraft to Continental including information about financing, payments, delivery etc. None of that information is relevant or reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence.

Request Nos. 7, 8: These requests seek all information about maintenance and repair documents relating to aircraft Defendant sold to Continental before 2010. These requests are overbroad and seek information not reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. For example, they are not limited to the airlines for whom Plaintiff's father worked, the type of planes Plaintiff's father worked on, the type of work he did, or the time period he worked on planes.

Request Nos. 10, 12, 13, 14, 18: Denied. These request seek all information related to asbestos on McDonnel Douglas' aircraft at any time, as well as all reports, studies, and memos about asbestos on McDonnel Douglas' aircraft, information about handling asbestos-containing materials, correspondence about asbestos, and the sources of all asbestos products on McDonnel Douglas' aircraft at any time. These requests are overbroad and seek information not reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. For example, they are not limited to the airlines for whom Plaintiff's father worked, the type of planes Plaintiff's father worked on, the type of work he did, or the time period he worked on planes. They would require Defendant to search records from the beginning of its existence and located throughout the world for all aircraft McDonnel Douglas sold anywhere in the world.

Request No. 11: Denied. This request duplicates No. 2.

Request No. 15: Denied. This request seeks all information about contracts and related documents for all aircraft McDonnel Douglas sold to Continental before 2010. This request would require all the production of information about the negotiations for all sales of aircraft to Continental including information about financing, payments, delivery, etc. for decades. None of that information is relevant or reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence.

Request Nos. 16, 17: These requests seek all information about maintenance and repair documents relating to aircraft McDonnel Douglas sold to Continental before 2010. These requests are overbroad and seek information not reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. For example, they are not limited to the airlines for whom Plaintiff's father worked, the type of planes Plaintiff's father worked on, the type of work he did, or the time period he worked on planes.

The motion is DENIED.

The moving party is to give notice.




Case Number: *******8396 Hearing Date: September 26, 2023 Dept: 15

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

On April 14, 2023, Plaintiffs Kathleen Hiland and John Brockett filed this action for personal injury caused by asbestos exposure. On September 20, 2023, Plaintiffs moved for trial preference under Code of Civil Procedure sections 36, subdivision (d).

The court has discretion to grant a motion for trial preference accompanied by clear and convincing medical documentation concluding that one of the parties suffers from an illness or condition raising substantial medical doubt of survival of that party beyond six months and satisfying the court that the interests of justice will be served by granting the preference. (Code Civ. Proc., 36, subd. (d).)

“Upon the granting of such a motion for preference, the court shall set the matter for trial not more than 120 days from that date and there shall be no continuance beyond 120 days from the granting of the motion for preference except for physical disability of a party or a party’s attorney, or upon a showing of good cause stated in the record.” (Id., 36, subd. (f).) “Any continuance shall be for no more than 15 days and no more than one continuance for physical disability may be granted to any party.” (Id.)

Plaintiffs submitted evidence that Hiland has stage IV epithelioid mesothelioma. (Niu Decl., 4, 8.) Dr. Jiaxin Niu reviewed Hiland’s medical record and personally observed and examined Hiland in conjunction with her mesothelioma and potential treatment options as her treating oncologist. (Id. at 4-5.) Hiland received chemotherapy treatment from July 2022 to September 2022 and thereafter started immunotherapy. (Id. at 9-10.) Radiology studies from January 2023 and March of 2023 show an increase in Hiland’s nodules. (Id. at 10.) A July 2023 radiology study shows that the cancer has significantly worsened and has not responded to additional treatment. (Ibid.) Hiland experiences fatigue and mild abdominal pain, which Dr. Niu declares will get worse over time. (Id. at 12.) Hiland is currently undergoing a third immunotherapy on a clinical trial, but it is not expected to cure her mesothelioma. (Id. at 13.) Dr. Niu concluded Hiland’s health will continue to decline, and there is substantial medical doubt as to Hiland's ability to survive beyond six months. (Niu Decl., 15.)

Defendants Hyster-Yale Group and Pneumo Abex argue that Plaintiffs’ moving papers do not provide any medical documentation supporting the prognosis that Hiland is unlikely to live more than six months. (Ibid.) However, Dr. Jiaxin Niu’s declaration provides sufficient details about her medical records, recent condition, and prognosis. (Niu Decl., 4-5.)

Based on the foregoing, the Court finds there is sufficient evidence to meet the clear and convincing standard for granting this motion. The Court further finds that the interests of justice will be served upon the granting of preference in this case as this would allow Hiland to pursue her case while she is still able to.

The motion is GRANTED. The trial is set for January 22, 2024 at 9 a.m. The final status conference is January 8, 2024 at 9 a.m. The parties are to meet and confer on a trial setting order. A status conference on a trial setting order is set for October 3, 2023 at 9 a.m.

The moving party is to give notice.



Case Number: *******8396 Hearing Date: September 20, 2023 Dept: 15

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION FOR PREFERENCE

On April 14, 2023, Plaintiffs Kathleen Hiland and John Brockett filed this action for personal injury caused by asbestos exposure. On September 20, 2023, Plaintiffs moved for trial preference under Code of Civil Procedure sections 36, subdivision (d).

The court has discretion to grant a motion for trial preference accompanied by clear and convincing medical documentation concluding that one of the parties suffers from an illness or condition raising substantial medical doubt of survival of that party beyond six months and satisfying the court that the interests of justice will be served by granting the preference. (Code Civ. Proc., 36, subd. (d).)

“Upon the granting of such a motion for preference, the court shall set the matter for trial not more than 120 days from that date and there shall be no continuance beyond 120 days from the granting of the motion for preference except for physical disability of a party or a party’s attorney, or upon a showing of good cause stated in the record.” (Id., 36, subd. (f).) “Any continuance shall be for no more than 15 days and no more than one continuance for physical disability may be granted to any party.” (Id.)

Plaintiffs submitted evidence that Hiland has stage IV epithelioid mesothelioma. (Niu Decl., 4, 8.) Dr. Jiaxin Niu reviewed Hiland’s medical record and personally observed and examined Hiland in conjunction with her mesothelioma and potential treatment options as her treating oncologist. (Id. at 4-5.) Hiland received chemotherapy treatment from July 2022 to September 2022 and thereafter started immunotherapy. (Id. at 9-10.) Radiology studies from January 2023 and March of 2023 show an increase in Hiland’s nodules. (Id. at 10.) A July 2023 radiology study shows that the cancer has significantly worsened and has not responded to additional treatment. (Ibid.) Hiland experiences fatigue and mild abdominal pain, which Dr. Niu declares will get worse over time. (Id. at 12.) Hiland is currently undergoing a third immunotherapy on a clinical trial, but it is not expected to cure her mesothelioma. (Id. at 13.) Dr. Niu concluded Hiland’s health will continue to decline, and there is substantial medical doubt as to Hiland's ability to survive beyond six months. (Niu Decl., 15.)

Defendants Hyster-Yale Group and Pneumo Abex argue that Plaintiffs’ moving papers do not provide any medical documentation supporting the prognosis that Hiland is unlikely to live more than six months. (Ibid.) However, Dr. Jiaxin Niu’s declaration provides sufficient details about her medical records, recent condition, and prognosis. (Niu Decl., 4-5.)

Based on the foregoing, the Court finds there is sufficient evidence to meet the clear and convincing standard for granting this motion. The Court further finds that the interests of justice will be served upon the granting of preference in this case as this would allow Hiland to pursue her case while she is still able to.

The motion is GRANTED. The trial is set for January 16, 2024 at 9 a.m. The final status conference is January 2, 2024 at 9 a.m. The parties are to meet and confer on a trial setting order. A status conference on a trial setting order is set for September 28, 20023 at 9 a.m.

The moving party is to give notice.



Case Number: *******8396 Hearing Date: September 14, 2023 Dept: 15

ORDER RE MOTIONS TO QUASH (VANDERBILT MINERAL)

Plaintiffs Kathleen Hiland and John Hiland allege Kathleen Hiland developed mesothelioma as a result of exposure to asbestos in talc supplied by Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC, Inc. Defendant filed a motion to quash service of summons for lack of personal jurisdiction.

A defendant may move to quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (a)(1).) The court may dismiss without prejudice the complaint in whole, or as to that defendant, when dismissal is made pursuant to Section 418.10. (Code Civ. Proc., 581, subd. (h).)

“A court of this state may exercise jurisdiction on any basis not inconsistent with the Constitution of this state or of the United States.” (Code Civ. Proc., 410.10.) “The Due Process Clause protects an individual’s liberty interest in not being subject to the binding judgments of a forum with which he has established no meaningful ‘contacts, ties, or relations.’” (Burger King Corp. v. Rudzewicz (1985) 471 U.S. 462, 471-472.) A state court may not exercise personal jurisdiction over a party under circumstances that would offend “traditional notions of fair play and substantial justice.” (Asahi Metal Industry Co., Ltd., v. Superior Court of California, Solano County (1987) 480 U.S. 102, 113.)

When a defendant moves to quash service of process on jurisdictional grounds, the plaintiff has the initial burden of demonstrating facts justifying the exercise of jurisdiction. (Jayone Foods, Inc. v. Aekyung Industrial Co. Ltd. (2019) 31 Cal.App.5th 543, 553.) Once facts showing minimum contacts with the forum state are established, the defendant has the burden to demonstrate that the exercise of jurisdiction would be unreasonable. (Ibid.) “The plaintiff must provide specific evidentiary facts, through affidavits and other authenticated documents, sufficient to allow the court to independently conclude whether jurisdiction is appropriate. [Citation.] The plaintiff cannot rely on allegations in an unverified complaint or vague and conclusory assertions of ultimate facts. [Citation.]” (Strasner v. Touchstone Wireless Repair & Logistics, LP (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 215, 222.)

A defendant is subject to a state’s general jurisdiction if its contacts “are so continuance and systematic as to render [it] essentially at home in the forum State.” (Saimler AG v. Bauman (2014) 571 U.S. 117, 127.) A nonresident defendant may be subject to the specific jurisdiction of the forum “if the defendant has purposefully availed himself or herself of forum benefits [citation], and the ‘controversy is related to or “arises out of” a defendant’s contacts with the forum.’ [Citations.]” (Vons Companies, Inc. v. Seabest Foods, Inc. (1996) 14 Cal.4th 434, 446.) This test does not require a “causal relationship between the defendant’s in-state activity and the litigation.” (Ford Motor Co. v. Montana Eighth Judicial District Court (2021) 141 S.Ct. 1017, 1026.) The “arise out” of standard “asks about causation,” but “relate to” does not. (Ibid.) “[W]hen a corporation has ‘continuously and deliberately exploited [a State’s] market, it must reasonably anticipate being haled into [that State’s] court[s]’ to defend actions ‘based on’ products causing injury there.” (Id. at p. 1027.)

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC provided evidence that it is incorporated in Delaware and has its principal place of business in Connecticut (Stewart Decl., 2), and therefore it is not a resident of California and not subject to its general jurisdiction.

Defendant argues it is not subject to California’s specific jurisdiction unless Plaintiffs can prove Kathleen Hiland was exposed in California to asbestos in a product that contained Defendant’s talc. (Motion at p. 4.) Defendant argues the complaint does not allege the specific products at issue. (Ibid.)

Defendant is correct that the complaint provides no information about the specific products at issue. Only in their opposition do Plaintiffs identify the products –DAP caulk products. (Opposition at p. 1.) Plaintiffs argue Defendant assumed the liability of R.T. Vanderbilt Company, which had a talc mine and sales office in California. (Opposition at p. 3; Eyerly Decl., Ex. 4 at pp. 39-40; Ex. 7 at p. 1430.) According to Plaintiffs, the talc contained asbestos. R.T. Vanderbilt Company supplied talc to DAP. (Eyerly Decl., Ex. 9 at pp. 162-163.)

In its reply, Defendant acknowledges it mined and sold talc in California. (Reply at p. 2.) Thus, it availed itself of the benefits of the forum. However, Defendant contends Plaintiffs have no evidence that Defendant’s talc was in the DAP caulk products to which Hiland was exposed. (Reply at pp. 2-3.)

Plaintiffs request jurisdictional discovery to obtain evidence that Defendant’s talc was in the DAP caulk products to which Hiland was exposed. The court CONTINUES this motion to December 12, 2023 at 9 a.m. for jurisdictional discovery on whether Defendant’s talc was in the DAP caulk products to which Hiland was exposed. Plaintiffs may file a supplemental opposition and Defendant may file a supplemental reply on regular notice.

The moving party is to give notice.