This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2023 at 18:33:18 (UTC).

AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and CAROLYN B. KUHL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0765

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

CAROLYN B. KUHL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AEGIS SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

DB INSURANCE CO. LTD

SEAVIEW INSURANCE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANDOVAL KATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/6/2023: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/7/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/28/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Related Case

5/5/2023: Notice of Related Case

Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

8/8/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/21/2023

8/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 08/21/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

9/14/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT

Notice of Ruling

9/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Aegis Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Seaview Insurance (Plaintiff); DB Insurance Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Report; Filed by: Aegis Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Seaview Insurance (Plaintiff); DB Insurance Co., LTD (Plaintiff); Southern California Edison, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Case scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/07/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 12 - Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Related Case scheduled for 10/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Aegis Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Seaview Insurance (Plaintiff); DB Insurance Co., LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Aegis Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Seaview Insurance (Plaintiff); DB Insurance Co., LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Aegis Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Seaview Insurance (Plaintiff); DB Insurance Co., LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison, a California corporation (Defendant); Edison International, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less