This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/16/2023 at 16:18:11 (UTC).

SHIRLEY PERKINS VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 SHIRLEY PERKINS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0732

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERKINS SHIRLEY

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES PUBLIC WORKS DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELLOSO DULCE C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/13/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/13/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2024
  • Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Shirley Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works Department (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Shirley Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works Department (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Shirley Perkins (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works Department (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less