This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2023 at 01:29:54 (UTC).

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL. VS LOREN W. BURCH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOREN W. BURCH LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 1, 2020, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2023 THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOREN W BURCH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOREN W BURCH LIVING TRUST DATED SEPTEMBER 1, 2020,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0895

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

LOREN W. BURCH INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE LOREN W. BURCH LIVING TRUST

PASADENA HERBAL CLUB A BUSINESS ENTITY FORM UNKNOWN

RAMIREZ AN INDIVIDUAL JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASTILLO CAROLINE K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/19/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/19/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/19/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/19/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/21/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

6/12/2023: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • Hearing09/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Jesus Ramirez, an individual; On the Complaint filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, et al. on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: 09/19/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant) to Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); Service Cost: 84.00; Service Date: 05/16/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); As to: PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketDefault entered as to PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown; On the Complaint filed by THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, et al. on 04/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 09/12/2023 ; As To Parties changed from PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant) to PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Summons on Complaint; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from LOREN W. BURCH individually and as trustee of the Loren W. Burch Living Trust Dated September 1, 2020 (Defendant), PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant), Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant) to PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant), LOREN W. BURCH individually and as trustee of the Loren W. Burch Living Trust Dated September 1, 2020 (Defendant), Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Plaintiff); As to: LOREN W. BURCH individually and as trustee of the Loren W. Burch Living Trust Dated September 1, 2020 (Defendant); Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Plaintiff); As to: LOREN W. BURCH individually and as trustee of the Loren W. Burch Living Trust Dated September 1, 2020 (Defendant); Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (Plaintiff); As to: LOREN W. BURCH individually and as trustee of the Loren W. Burch Living Trust Dated September 1, 2020 (Defendant); Jesus Ramirez, an individual (Defendant); PASADENA HERBAL CLUB, a business entity, form unknown (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less