This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2023 at 06:03:06 (UTC).

PERLA MAGENO VS BIAGIO PAVIA

Case Summary

On 03/20/2023 PERLA MAGENO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BIAGIO PAVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0621

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGENO PERLA

Defendant

PAVIA BIAGIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANNING JR. JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

OKELBERRY NATHAN V.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/20/2023: Complaint

Summons Summons on Complaint

3/20/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/21/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/21/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

5/30/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

Answer

6/16/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

8/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

 

Docket Entries

01/11/2024

Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2024

Hearing01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Trial Setting Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketStatus Conference Re: Mediation and Discovery scheduled for 01/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 08/18/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant); As to: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/26/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant); Service Date: 04/19/2023; Service Cost: 74.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/21/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Perla Mageno (Plaintiff); As to: BIAGIO PAVIA (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less