This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 04:42:43 (UTC).

EFREN SANCHEZ VS GOLDSMITH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/11/2023 EFREN SANCHEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GOLDSMITH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7937

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ EFREN

Defendant

GOLDSMITH CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

REYNAGA ALICIA

ALEMZADEH BERKEH

MAHONEY KEVIN

Defendant Attorneys

BEHRENS MICHAEL A.

COHEN ELLEN CONNELLY

EGLEY JOHN T.

 

Court Documents

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING RE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

9/15/2023: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING RE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

9/6/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Answer

6/23/2023: Answer

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

6/16/2023: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

6/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER AFTER HEARING RE: FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/5/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

5/31/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

5/2/2023: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Initial Status Conference Order

4/20/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/20/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

4/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 04/20/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/11/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/11/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/11/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2024
  • Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Order After Hearing Re Post-Mediation Status Conference; Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 09/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Statement; Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer Of Defendant Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. To The Complaint: Name Extension: Of Defendant Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. To The Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service; Signed and Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Order After Hearing Re: Further Status Conference; Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elihu M. Berle in Department 6 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketAddress for Kevin Mahoney (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketNotice of Errata Re Complaint Exhibit; Filed by: Efren Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Goldsmith Construction Company, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less