This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 07:48:20 (UTC).

DIEGO HERRERA VS AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 DIEGO HERRERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1443

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERRERA DIEGO

Defendants

AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AUTOVIC MOTORS; AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

VEROS AUTO CREDIT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY A SOUTH DAKOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS BEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/15/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/15/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/15/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/15/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/15/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/19/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/25/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff); As to: AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); AUTOVIC MOTORS; an unknown business entity (Defendant); VEROS AUTO CREDIT INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff); As to: VEROS AUTO CREDIT INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department O - Hon. Christian R. Gulloneffective 05/22/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff); As to: AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); AUTOVIC MOTORS; an unknown business entity (Defendant); VEROS AUTO CREDIT INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas C. Falls in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff); As to: AMENERO INVESTMENT GROUP, a California corporation (Defendant); AUTOVIC MOTORS; an unknown business entity (Defendant); VEROS AUTO CREDIT INC., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: DIEGO HERRERA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less