This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2023 at 07:22:57 (UTC).

TOYIA L. PARKER VS ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC., A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 TOYIA L PARKER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4134

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER TOYIA L.

Defendant

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

KEPLER STEPHEN J.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/24/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/27/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/8/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

3/30/2023: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/8/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/14/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2023

6/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/14/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2024
  • Hearing08/12/2024 at 10:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2024
  • Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 08/12/2024 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 06/14/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Toyia L. Parker (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Toyia L. Parker (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability company to Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Toyia L. Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Toyia L. Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Toyia L. Parker (Plaintiff); As to: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of Los Angeles, LLC., a Delaware Limited Liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less