This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/26/2023 at 07:47:45 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE, N.A. VS GABINA DURAN

Case Summary

On 05/12/2023 CAPITAL ONE, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GABINA DURAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1485

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE N.A.

Defendant

DURAN GABINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

APOSHIAN GEORGE

 

Court Documents

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS

5/12/2023: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/12/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/12/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/12/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/12/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/16/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

8/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

8/21/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/08/2023; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration DECLARATION RE:NONMILITARY STATUS; Filed by: CAPITAL ONE, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: GABINA DURAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less