This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2023 at 07:04:33 (UTC).

SARA PINEDA VS HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/18/2023 SARA PINEDA filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2869

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA SARA

Defendant

HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Demand for Jury Trial

9/18/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/18/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/18/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/20/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/18/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

02/13/2024

Hearing02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department O at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/26/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SARA PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Date: 09/21/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 09:00 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/13/2024 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/19/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Christian R. Gullon in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: SARA PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SARA PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SARA PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: SARA PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA, a California Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less