This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2023 at 08:37:23 (UTC).

RODOLFO ZARATE VS CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 RODOLFO ZARATE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1977

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZARATE RODOLFO

Defendant

CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorney

HORTON THOMAS JEFFREY S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/4/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/5/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/19/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL & NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

7/14/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL & NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

Answer

8/7/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

10/31/2023

Hearing10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail & Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff); As to: CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, a California corporation (Defendant); Mailing Date: 06/16/2023; Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 05/19/2023 ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff); As to: CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff); As to: CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RODOLFO ZARATE (Plaintiff); As to: CLARK AND WHITE LANDSCAPE, a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less