This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/23/2023 at 07:19:34 (UTC).

TURTLE & HUGHES INC., A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION VS HUSIK IGNATYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2023 TURTLE HUGHES INC , A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HUSIK IGNATYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1950

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TURTLE & HUGHES INC. A NEW JERSEY CORPORATION

Defendants

IGNATYAN HUSIK DBA CALIFORNIA GENERAL POWER

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY A TEXAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/13/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/13/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/13/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/13/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/13/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/15/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

05/29/2024

Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2024

Hearing03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department E at 600 East Broadway, Glendale, CA 91206; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Turtle & Hughes Inc., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 176.46; Service Date: 10/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ashfaq G. Chowdhury in Department E Glendale Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Turtle & Hughes Inc., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Husik Ignatyan (Defendant); Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Turtle & Hughes Inc., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Husik Ignatyan (Defendant); Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Turtle & Hughes Inc., a New Jersey corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Husik Ignatyan (Defendant); Suretec Insurance Company, a Texas corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less