This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2023 at 00:10:40 (UTC).

GRACE CABERIO VS CORINTHIAN HOSPICE, INC. (A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 GRACE CABERIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CORINTHIAN HOSPICE, INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1117

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABERIO GRACE

Defendant

CORINTHIAN HOSPICE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/17/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

5/17/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/17/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/17/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/18/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

09/15/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Grace Caberio on 05/17/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Grace Caberio as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); As to: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 09/15/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Grace Caberio (Plaintiff), Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (Defendant) to Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (Defendant), Grace Caberio (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/15/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gregory Keosian in Department 61 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketUpdated -- Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (a California corporation) to Corinthian Hospice, Inc.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketAddress for Ricardo Yuaga Merluza (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 61

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Grace Caberio (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian Hospice, Inc. (a California corporation) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less