This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2023 at 04:10:20 (UTC).

ESTEBAN PINEDA VS ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC. AN INDIANA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2023 ESTEBAN PINEDA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC AN INDIANA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and GARY Y. TANAKA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1409

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

GARY Y. TANAKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PINEDA ESTEBAN

Defendants

ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES INC. NC

SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY INC.

SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorneys

HAGOPIAN DAVID GEORGE

DAROUIAN NIMA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

11/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

10/25/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

10/9/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Related Case) of 08/03/2023

8/3/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Related Case) of 08/03/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Related Case)

8/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re: Related Case)

Notice of Related Case

7/18/2023: Notice of Related Case

Answer

7/3/2023: Answer

Answer

6/30/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

5/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2023

5/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/22/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/18/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

5/15/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/3/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/11/2024

Hearing04/11/2024 at 4:30 PM in Department 12 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Filing of the Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 04/11/2024 at 04:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/14/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 11/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 11/14/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 11/14/2023 11:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/25/2023 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 11:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 10/09/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Esteban Pineda (Plaintiff): First Name changed from ESTEBAN to Esteban; Last Name changed from PINEDA to Pineda

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
05/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT UNDER THE LABOR CODE PRIVATE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ACT OF 2004 FOR CIVIL PENALTIES UNDER LABOR CODE SECTIONS 210, 226.3, 558, 1174.5, 1197.1 and 2699 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL [Amount in Controversy Greater Than $25,000.00]; Filed by: ESTEBAN PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC. an Indiana corporation (Defendant); SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING, L.P., a California limited partnership, doing business as SunRider International (Defendant); SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet And Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: ESTEBAN PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC. an Indiana corporation (Defendant); SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING, L.P., a California limited partnership, doing business as SunRider International (Defendant); SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: ESTEBAN PINEDA (Plaintiff); As to: ELWOOD STAFFING SERVICES, INC. an Indiana corporation (Defendant); SUNRIDER MANUFACTURING, L.P., a California limited partnership, doing business as SunRider International (Defendant); SUNLIFE HERBAL COMPANY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less