This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2023 at 07:11:59 (UTC).

JOSE GUADALUPE SOTO-RODRIGUEZ, ET AL. VS AKG TRADING (USA), INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 JOSE GUADALUPE SOTO-RODRIGUEZ, filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against AKG TRADING USA , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8440

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Defendants

AKG TRADING USA INC.

ANTOLINI LUIGI & CSPA

ARCHITECTURAL SURFACES INC.

ARIZONA TILE L.L.C.

BELLA STONE & TILE

C & C NORTH AMERICA INC.

CAESARSTONE USA INC.

CAMBRIA COMPANY LLC

CI STONE

CONTINENTAL STONE

COSENTINO GROUP

D C S INC.

DAL-TILE DISTRIBUTION INC.

DMD MARBLE & GRANITE INC.

DURANGO MARBLE

E. I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY

FRANCINI INC.

G & G MARBLE & QUARTZ INC.

IMPERIAL TILE & STONE

LX HAUSYS AMERICA INC

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

METZGER RAPHAEL

BRUST SCOTT PHILIP

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

4/17/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/19/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/28/2023

4/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 04/28/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

4/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. NON-COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 05/01/2023

5/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;) OF 05/01/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

5/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT;)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/10/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/30/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2023
  • Hearing09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Walker Zanger, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketAddress for Raphael Metzger (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 17 - Hon. Jon R. Takasugi; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court;) of 05/01/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Michelle Williams Court; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non--Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Sara Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Sara Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: AKG Trading (USA), Inc. (Defendant); Architectural Surfaces, Inc. (Defendant); Antolini Luigi & CSPA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Sara Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: AKG Trading (USA), Inc. (Defendant); Architectural Surfaces, Inc. (Defendant); Antolini Luigi & CSPA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Sara Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: AKG Trading (USA), Inc. (Defendant); Architectural Surfaces, Inc. (Defendant); Antolini Luigi & CSPA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketPlaintiffs' Statement of Damages; Filed by: Jose Guadalupe Soto-Rodriguez (Plaintiff); Sara Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: AKG Trading (USA), Inc. (Defendant); Architectural Surfaces, Inc. (Defendant); Antolini Luigi & CSPA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less