This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2023 at 01:43:44 (UTC).

DENISE LOCKRIDGE VS PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2023 DENISE LOCKRIDGE filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3176

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOCKRIDGE DENISE

Defendants

BLP STAFFING SOLUTIONS LLC

HYATT CORPORATION

HYATT HOTELS CORPORATION

PERALTA JOSE

PERLAZ HOSPITALITY GROUP LLC

PRISM HOSPITALITY L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANCK LEE KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

CHANG CHLOE S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/29/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Minute Order Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

11/27/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/27/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/27/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/22/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Continuance Notice of Continuance OF HEARING AND ORDER

11/21/2023: Notice of Continuance Notice of Continuance OF HEARING AND ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/21/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/13/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/6/2023: Answer Answer TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/3/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

10/3/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

9/11/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/30/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/4/2023: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

7/26/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

7/26/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2025

Hearing02/10/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2025

Hearing01/31/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2024

Hearing02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: RE: Status of Resolve Law LA MSC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: Denise Lockridge (Plaintiff); Result: Not Entered ; Result Date: 11/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: Denise Lockridge (Plaintiff); Result: Not Entered ; Result Date: 11/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 11/29/2023 to 11/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2023

DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment: Status Date changed from 11/29/2023 to 11/29/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: RE: Status of Resolve Law LA MSC scheduled for 02/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
06/09/2023

DocketAddress for Scott Ohara Cummings (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketAddress for Lee Kenneth Franck (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Denise Lockridge (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions, LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Denise Lockridge (Plaintiff); As to: Perlaz Hospitality Group LLC (Defendant); BLP Staffing Solutions, LLC (Defendant); Hyatt Hotels Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less