This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2023 at 04:39:54 (UTC).

JOHN DOE VS BOYS AND GIRLS CLUB OF SAN FERNANDO VALLEY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/12/2023 JOHN DOE filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against BOYS AND GIRLS CLUB OF SAN FERNANDO VALLEY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN J. KRALIK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0792

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN J. KRALIK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE JOHN

Defendants

BOYS AND GIRLS CLUB OF SAN FERNANDO VALLEY

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

GONZALEZ HENRY HERNANDEZ

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

9/12/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

9/5/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/24/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/22/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/27/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF HENRY H. GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 430.41

6/14/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration OF HENRY H. GONZALEZ IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR AUTOMATIC EXTENSION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 430.41

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/12/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/3/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

5/1/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/13/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/13/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/12/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

4/12/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/12/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/12/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

4/12/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/27/2023

Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Boys and Girls Club of San Fernando Valley (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/27/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketAddress for Henry Hernandez Gonzalez (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketAddress for Sean Adrian Andrade (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
04/13/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. John J. Kralik in Department B Burbank Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Boys and Girls Club of San Fernando Valley (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Boys and Girls Club of San Fernando Valley (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Doe (Plaintiff); As to: Boys and Girls Club of San Fernando Valley (Defendant); Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less