This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 05:28:31 (UTC).

TRAVIS GABOR JACKSON VS RENT A CENTER, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 TRAVIS GABOR JACKSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RENT A CENTER, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1183

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACKSON TRAVIS GABOR

NAY CATHERINE

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25

SORIANO JAVIER JARQUIN

UPBOUND GROUP INC DBA RENT A CENTER INC DBA RENT A CENTER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUERRERO ALEX DAVID

Defendant Attorney

HARWELL LILLIAN C

 

Court Documents

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE, PROPERTY DAMAGE, PERSONAL INJURY

4/17/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE, PROPERTY DAMAGE, PERSONAL INJURY

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

4/24/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/13/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

6/13/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/28/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/1/2023: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2023
  • Hearing10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Upbound Group, Inc dba Rent A Center, Inc (Defendant); As to: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Javier Jarquin Soriano (Defendant); Service Date: 07/21/2023; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: Upbound Group, Inc dba Rent A Center, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/21/2023; Service Cost: 74.98; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM: Name Extension: (1st)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Upbound Group, Inc (Defendant): Organization Name changed from RENT A CENTER, INC. to Upbound Group, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Upbound Group, Inc dba Rent A Center, Inc (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Upbound Group, Inc to Upbound Group, Inc dba Rent A Center, Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Catherine Nay (Plaintiff): First Name changed from CATHERINE to Catherine; Last Name changed from NAY to Nay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2023
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); Catherine Nay (Plaintiff); As to: Upbound Group, Inc dba Rent A Center, Inc (Defendant); DOES 1 TO 25 (Defendant); Javier Jarquin Soriano (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 10/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint For Motor Vehicle, Property Damage, Personal Injury; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: RENT A CENTER, INC. (Defendant); DOES 1 TO 25 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet And Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: RENT A CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Travis Gabor Jackson (Plaintiff); As to: RENT A CENTER, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less