This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 15:37:12 (UTC).

JESUS OMAR NAVARRO VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 JESUS OMAR NAVARRO filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1563

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVARRO JESUS OMAR

Defendants

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NORM REEVES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA NORM REEVES HONDA SUPERSTORE WEST COVINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JACOBSON KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/24/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/7/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/29/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/7/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/25/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 1427 West Covina Parkway, West Covina, CA 91790; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 6 at 1427 West Covina Parkway, West Covina, CA 91790; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to West Covina Courthouse in Department 6 - Hon. Lynette Gridiron Winstoneffective 08/14/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 10/25/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department K to Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 10/25/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department K to Department 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); As to: Jesus Omar Navarro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jesus Omar Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: NORM REEVES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/06/2023; Service Cost: 82.60; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jesus Omar Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department K Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jesus Omar Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); NORM REEVES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jesus Omar Navarro (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); NORM REEVES, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less