This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2023 at 07:26:32 (UTC).

BRAD M. YANDELL VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 BRAD M YANDELL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1850

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANDELL BRAD M.

Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSONS LLC DBA SAV-ON PHARMACY

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO NA INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON SUBSIDIARY ?OLD JJCI?;

KENVUE INC.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

RITE AID CORPORATION

SAFEWAY INC.

THRIFTY CORPORATION DBA RITE AID

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. DBA RITE AID SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS BENJAMIN H

BLUMENFELD-JAMES JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

ROMANO JULIA E.

YEZBEKYAN MIHRAN

CALFO ALEXANDER G.

CARNEY TERENCE P.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

7/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/7/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT SAFEWAY INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT SAFEWAY INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SAFEWAY INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SAFEWAY INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MIHRAN YEZBEKYAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT ALBERTSONS COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

7/3/2023: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - DEFENDANT THRIFTY PAYLESS, INC.'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC. AND KENVUE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF S

6/30/2023: Motion to Quash Service of Summons - SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC. AND KENVUE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF S

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIA E. ROMANO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC. AND KENVUE INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF

6/30/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JULIA E. ROMANO IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO (NA) INC. AND KENVUE INC.S MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF

Answer

6/29/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/29/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Request for Dismissal

6/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer - DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVORSHIP-ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/28/2023: Answer - DEFENDANT JOHNSON & JOHNSON ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVORSHIP-ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship - Asbestos for Defendant Albertsons Companies, Inc. (Yandell-23STCV11850)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship - Asbestos for Defendant Thrifty Payless Inc. (23STCV11850)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2023
  • Hearing08/01/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survivorship - Asbestos for Defendant Safeway Inc. (Yandell-23STCV11850)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice Of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); As to: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company (Defendant); As to: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Mihran Yezbekyan in Support of Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint: Name Extension changed from of Mihran Tezbekyan in Support of Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint to of Mihran Yezbekyan in Support of Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Brad M. Yandell on 05/25/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Brad M. Yandell as to Albertsons Companies, Inc., Albertsons LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Safeway Inc., Thrifty Corporation, and Thrifty Payless, Inc., causes Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, and Seventh Causes of Action as to Albertson's Companies, Inc., Albertsons LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Thrifty Holdings, Inc., Safeway Inc., Thrifty Corporation, Thrifty Payless, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant Thrifty Payless, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Mihran Tezbekyan in Support of Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/03/2023
  • DocketDefendant Safeway Inc.'s Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Safeway Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less