This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2023 at 10:41:27 (UTC).

BRAD M. YANDELL VS JOHNSON & JOHNSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 BRAD M YANDELL filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1850

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YANDELL BRAD M.

Defendants

ALBERTSONS COMPANIES INC.

ALBERTSONS LLC DBA SAV-ON PHARMACY

JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON HOLDCO NA INC. FKA JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO JOHNSON & JOHNSON SUBSIDIARY ?OLD JJCI?;

KENVUE INC.

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

RITE AID CORPORATION

SAFEWAY INC.

THRIFTY CORPORATION DBA RITE AID

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. DBA RITE AID SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THRIFTY PAYLESS HOLDINGS INC.

LTL MANAGEMENT LLC DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ADAMS BENJAMIN H

BLUMENFELD-JAMES JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

CARNEY TERENCE P.

CALFO ALEXANDER G.

CHAN RYAN HO WAI

ROMANO JULIA E.

YEZBEKYAN MIHRAN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Rite Aid Corporation and Certain of its Affiliates and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings

10/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Suggestion of Bankruptcy for Rite Aid Corporation and Certain of its Affiliates and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Group (Dean Omar Branham Shirley, LLP);...)

10/4/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference re: Group (Dean Omar Branham Shirley, LLP);...)

Answer Defendant LTL Management, LLC’s Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint for Wrongful Death and Suvivorship; Demand for Jury Trial

9/18/2023: Answer Defendant LTL Management, LLC’s Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint for Wrongful Death and Suvivorship; Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/17/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Order - Dismissal

8/16/2023: Order - Dismissal

Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order

8/16/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...)

8/15/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Rhona S. Reddix, CSR # 10807

8/15/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Rhona S. Reddix, CSR # 10807

Notice (name extension) Notice Of Further, Continued Hearing On Motion By Specially Appearing Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (Na) Inc., And Kenvue Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction

8/1/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice Of Further, Continued Hearing On Motion By Specially Appearing Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (Na) Inc., And Kenvue Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...)

7/28/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons for Lack of Per...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore CSR: Gaye L. Limon/ #7416

7/28/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore CSR: Gaye L. Limon/ #7416

Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

7/26/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

Answer Defendant Safeway Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

7/25/2023: Answer Defendant Safeway Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

Answer Defendant Albertsons Companies, Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

7/25/2023: Answer Defendant Albertsons Companies, Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

Answer Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc. Dba Rite Aid Corporation’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

7/25/2023: Answer Defendant Thrifty Payless, Inc. Dba Rite Aid Corporation’s Answer To Plaintiff’s Complaint For Wrongful Death And Survivorship – Asbestos; Affirmative Defenses; Demand For Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

7/25/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

7/25/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

7/25/2023: Notice of Appearance Notice of Remote Appearance

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/28/2024

Hearing10/28/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/14/2024

Hearing10/14/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2024

Hearing04/03/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 15 - Hon. Laura A. Seigle; Reason: Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy for Rite Aid Corporation and Certain of its Affiliates and Notice of Automatic Stay of Proceedings; Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Group (Dean Omar Branham Shirley, LLP);...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Status Conference re: Group (Dean Omar Branham Shirley, LLP);...): Status Date changed from 10/04/2023 to 10/04/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2023

DocketDefendant LTL Management, LLCs Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Wrongful Death and Suvivorship; Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant); As to: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: LTL MANAGEMENT, LLC (Doe 1) (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
06/09/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by: Brad M. Yandell (Plaintiff); As to: Johnson & Johnson (Defendant); Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. (Defendant); Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1850 Hearing Date: August 15, 2023 Dept: 15

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE MOTION TO QUASH

Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., and Kenvue Inc. filed a motion to quash for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff Brad Yandell alleges Lucia Yandell was injured by exposure to asbestos in talc in Defendants’ products. Plaintiff alleges Lucia Yandell used talcum powder products from the mid-1950s to 2016. (Complaint, Ex. A.)

A defendant may move to quash service of summons on the ground of lack of jurisdiction. (Code Civ. Proc., 418.10, subd. (a)(1).) The court may dismiss without prejudice the complaint in whole, or as to that defendant, when dismissal is made pursuant to Section 418.10. (Code Civ. Proc., 581, subd. (h).)

“A court of this state may exercise jurisdiction on any basis not inconsistent with the Constitution of this state or of the United States.” (Code Civ. Proc., 410.10.) “The Due Process Clause protects an individual’s liberty interest in not being subject to the binding judgments of a forum with which he has established no meaningful ‘contacts, ties, or relations.’” (Burger King Corp. v. Rudzewicz (1985) 471 U.S. 462, 471-472.) A state court may not exercise personal jurisdiction over a party under circumstances that would offend “traditional notions of fair play and substantial justice.” (Asahi Metal Industry Co., Ltd., v. Superior Court of California, Solano County (1987) 480 U.S. 102, 113.)

When a defendant moves to quash service of process on jurisdictional grounds, the plaintiff has the initial burden of demonstrating facts justifying the exercise of jurisdiction. (Jayone Foods, Inc. v. Aekyung Industrial Co. Ltd. (2019) 31 Cal.App.5th 543, 553.) Once facts showing minimum contacts with the forum state are established, the defendant has the burden to demonstrate that the exercise of jurisdiction would be unreasonable. (Ibid.) “The plaintiff must provide specific evidentiary facts, through affidavits and other authenticated documents, sufficient to allow the court to independently conclude whether jurisdiction is appropriate. [Citation.] The plaintiff cannot rely on allegations in an unverified complaint or vague and conclusory assertions of ultimate facts. [Citation.]” (Strasner v. Touchstone Wireless Repair & Logistics, LP (2016) 5 Cal.App.5th 215, 222.)

A defendant is subject to a state’s general jurisdiction if its contacts “are so continuance and systematic as to render [it] essentially at home in the forum State.” (Saimler AG v. Bauman (2014) 571 U.S. 117, 127.) A nonresident defendant may be subject to the specific jurisdiction of the forum “if the defendant has purposefully availed himself or herself of forum benefits [citation], and the ‘controversy is related to or “arises out of” a defendant’s contacts with the forum.’ [Citations.]” (Vons Companies, Inc. v. Seabest Foods, Inc. (1996) 14 Cal.4th 434, 446.) This test does not require a “causal relationship between the defendant’s in-state activity and the litigation.” (Ford Motor Co. v. Montana Eighth Judicial District Court (2021) 141 S.Ct. 1017, 1026.) The “arise out” of standard “asks about causation,” but “relate to” does not. (Ibid.) “[W]hen a corporation has ‘continuously and deliberately exploited [a State’s] market, it must reasonably anticipate being haled into [that State’s] court[s]’ to defend actions ‘based on’ products causing injury there.” (Id. at p. 1027.)

Plaintiff does not dispute that there is no general jurisdiction over Defendants.

Defendants contend Plaintiff cannot show California has specific jurisdiction over Defendants because they never sold talc-based powder in California or the U.S. (Motion at p. 2.) In other words, Defendants argue Plaintiff’s claims do not arise out of or relate to Defendants’ contacts with California. According to Defendants, Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. and Kenvue Inc. came into existence after 2020 and never sold talc-based powder in California at any time. (Motion at p. 2.) LTL Management, LLC holds the liability for talc-related claims against Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Motion at p. 3.) And Defendants state Janssen is a pharmaceutical company that never sold talcum powder products. (Motion at p. 4.)

Plaintiff starts by arguing Defendants have consented to California jurisdiction by registering to do business in California. (Opposition at p. 9.) This argument is meritless. First, California courts have repeatedly held that “designation of an agent for service or process and qualification to do business in California alone are insufficient to permit general jurisdiction. (Thomson v. Anderson (2003) 113 Cal.App.4th 258, 268.) Plaintiff ignores this well-established California law. Second, Plaintiff’s reliance on the recent case Supreme Court case Mallory v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. skips over the key distinguishing fact – that case analyzed a Pennsylvania statute “requir[ing] out-of-state companies that register to do business in the Commonwealth to agree to appear in its courts on ‘any cause of action’ against them. 42 Pa. Cons. Stat. 5301 (a)(2)(i), (b) (2019).” (Mallory v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co. (2023) 143 S.Ct. 2028, 2033.) No such statute exists in California. Plaintiff’s argument based on Mallory has absolutely no merit.

Next, Plaintiff argues that this court should deny this motion for the same reasons that a New Jersey court denied a motion to quash brought by Defendants. (Oppposition at pp. 10-11.) But Plaintiff does not disclose the fact that the New Jersey court found all three Defendants are New Jersey corporations. (Ex. 17 at p. 3.) All three have their principal place of business in New Jersey, so of course New Jersey has jurisdiction over them. (Motion at pp. 2-3.) If they all had their principal place of business in California, then California would have jurisdiction. But that is not the case.

Then, Plaintiff argues that the original Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. merged into all three Defendants, making Defendants responsible for its talc-based liabilities. (Opposition at pp. 11-12.) The Third Circuit in LTL Management, LLC, 64 F.4th 84 (3rd. Cir. 2023) has already done most of the work in analyzing the structure of the J&J companies and the liability for talc-based claims. It explained that the original Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (“Old Consumer”) was a wholly owned subsidiary of Johnson & Johnson and sold baby powder. (Id. at p. 92.) “[S]ince 1979 only Old Consumer and its predecessors . . . have directly sold Johnson’s Baby Powder.” (Id. at p. 93.) In October 2021, Old Consumer was restructured into LTL Management and Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (“New Consumer”), and Old Consumer ceased to exist. (Id. at pp. 95-96.) In the restructuring, LTL Management took on all of the liabilities of Old Consumer for talc-related claims. (Id. at p. 96.) And New Consumer received all of the assets and other liabilities. (Id. at p. 97.) The Third Circuit determined that LTL Management “was highly solvent with access to cash to meet comfortably its liabilities as they came due for the foreseeable future,” and “has a funding backstop, not unlike an ATM disguised as a contract, that it can draw on to pay liabilities without any disruption to its business or threat to its financial viability.” (Id. at pp. 108, 109.) Because of that solvency, the Third Circuit dismissed the bankruptcy action.

Plaintiffs do not explain where the Third Circuit went wrong in determining that LTL Management holds all of the talc-based liabilities. If in fact, New Consumer actually held those liabilities and then merged with Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., and Kenvue Inc., making those three Defendants now liable, one would expect the Third Circuit to have mentioned that. This argument has no merit.

Plaintiff goes on to argue that Defendants are all product line successors under Ray v. Alad (1977) 19 Cal.3d 22 because they continue to manufacture and sell baby powder. (Opposition at p. 13.) The court in Ray analyzed the successor liability of a purchaser of the assets of a corporation. (Ray, supra, 19 Cal.3d at p. 28.) Generally, “the purchaser does not assume the seller’s liabilities unless: (1) there is an express or implied agreement of assumption, (2) the transaction amounts to a consolidation or merger of the two corporations, (3) the purchasing corporation is a mere continuation of the seller, or (4) the transfer of assets to the purchaser is for the fraudulent purpose of escaping liability for the seller’s debts.” (Ibid.) The case also recognized strict tort liability for defective products when a party acquires a manufacturing business and continues the output of its line of products “holding itself out to potential customers as the same enterprise,” thereby exploiting the prior business’ “established reputation as a going concern manufacturing a specific product line.” (Id. at p. 34.) The justification for imposing strict liability on the successor rests on “(1) the virtual destruction of the plaintiff’s remedies against the original manufacturer caused by the successor’s acquisition of the business, (2) the successor’s ability to assume the original manufacturer’s risk-spreading role, and (3) the fairness of requiring the successor to assume a responsibility for defective products that was a burden necessarily attached to the original manufacturer’s goodwill being enjoyed by the successor in the continued operation of the business.” (Id. at p. 31.)

Plaintiff cited no evidence that Janssen is holding itself out to consumers as the same enterprise as Old Consumer. It is a pharmaceutical company. In any event, Plaintiff did not establish he has no remedies “against the original manufacturer caused by the successor’s acquisition of the business.” To the contrary, the Third Circuit concluded that LTL Management has more than enough resources to cover any liability in the foreseeable future. (LTL Management, supra, 64 F.4th at pp. 108, 109.) Thus, Plaintiff did not come close to showing a potential for product line liability.

Finally, Plaintiff contends the three Defendants engaged in a fraudulent transfer to avoid liability. Plaintiff cites no law supporting this argument, which hinges on the assertion that Plaintiff has “been left with no remedy for [Lucia Yandell’s] injury.” (Opposition at p. 14.) That is not correct. As the Third Circuit determined, LTL Management has assets to cover talc-based liabilities. If the bankruptcy is not dismissed, Plaintiff can pursue his claims in the bankruptcy court. If it is dismissed, Plaintiff can sue LTL Management in this or another action.

Plaintiff asks for jurisdictional discovery. A plaintiff must show a basis in fact for jurisdictional discovery, some reason to conclude discovery is likely to produce evidence of California contacts sufficient for personal jurisdiction. (In re Automobile Antitrust Cases (2005) 136 Cal.App.4th 100, 127 [“In order to prevail on a motion for a continuance for jurisdictional discovery, the plaintiff should demonstrate that discovery is likely to lead to the production of evidence of facts establishing jurisdiction”].) When a plaintiff is not able to make an offer of proof of the existence of “additional relevant jurisdictional evidence,” a court does not abuse its discretion in denying jurisdictional discovery. (Ibid.)

Plaintiff did not demonstrate that discovery is likely to lead to the production of evidence of facts establishing jurisdiction over Defendants. Plaintiff wants broad discovery into all of Defendants’ contacts with California, all talcum power sales, and the manufacturing of talcum powder. This is extremely extensive discovery without the required explanation about how it is likely to lead to evidence showing jurisdiction. Lucia Yandell stopped using talcum powder in 2016, long before Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. and Kenvue Inc. even existed. Likewise, Old Consumer stopped selling talc-based powder in 2020 in the U.S, before Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc. and Kenvue Inc. were formed. (Ex. C; Ex. D at pp. 128.) Therefore, her claims cannot arise out of Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc.’s and Kenvue Inc.’s contacts with California.

And Plaintiff presented no evidence that Janssen was involved in talcum powder during the period she was using the product. Given that J&J is a public company, if Janssen was involved with manufacturing, marketing, distributing or selling talcum powder in the years before 2016, one would expect some mention of that in the public record, bankruptcy court filings, or Third Circuit decision. To the contrary, the Third Circuit stated that only Old Consumer sold baby powder. (LTL Management, supra, 64 F.4th at p. 93.)

Plaintiff states he want discovery into the three Defendants’ corporate formation and restructures. A significant amount of that information is in the public record – both SEC filings and bankruptcy court filings. Plaintiff did not identify what additional information about the Defendants he expects to find that would establish jurisdiction in California.

In sum, the proper defendant holding liability for Plaintiff’s claims is LTL Management. Either LTL Management’s bankruptcy case will be dismissed, in which case Plaintiffs can litigate its claims against LTL Management in this case or another state court action. Or the bankruptcy will proceed, and Plaintiff can pursue claims in the bankruptcy court. In both scenarios, Plaintiff have remedies against LTL Management.

The motion is GRANTED and the complaint against Defendants Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Holdco (NA) Inc., and Kenvue Inc. is DISMISSSED without prejudice pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 581, subdivision (h).

The moving parties are to give notice.