This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 12:46:43 (UTC).

JORGE PIMENTAL,, JR. VS NISSAN OF TORRANCE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2023 JORGE PIMENTAL,, JR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NISSAN OF TORRANCE, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5687

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIMENTAL JORGE JR.

Defendant

NISSAN OF TORRANCE A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIPELES KEVIN A.

Defendant Attorney

DESANTIS KEVIN VAL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/6/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/6/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/6/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/6/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/6/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/6/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/12/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/17/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/20/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer

8/21/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2023

Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

Hearing11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: NISSAN OF TORRANCE, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jorge Pimental,, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN OF TORRANCE, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/11/2023; Service Cost: 74.90; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketAddress for Kevin A. Lipeles (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Jorge Pimental,, JR. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jorge Pimental,, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN OF TORRANCE, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jorge Pimental,, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN OF TORRANCE, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jorge Pimental,, JR. (Plaintiff); As to: NISSAN OF TORRANCE, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less