This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2023 at 05:54:08 (UTC).

PHYLLIS FLEMING, VS RITE AID CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 PHYLLIS FLEMING, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against RITE AID CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2280

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLEMING PHYLLIS

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 50 INCLUSIVE

KELLEHER NICOLE

RITE AID CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. AKA RITE AID PHARMACY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON RANDI L.

Defendant Attorney

AVETISOVE ARTIN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR RITE AID CORPORATION AND CERTAIN OF ITS AFFILIATES AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

10/18/2023: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR RITE AID CORPORATION AND CERTAIN OF ITS AFFILIATES AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS

Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference Set for November 30,2023

10/16/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Case Management Conference Set for November 30,2023

Answer

8/22/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Deird...)

7/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Deird...)

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

7/26/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Deird...) of 07/26/2023

7/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer Deird...) of 07/26/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/19/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

7/19/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2024

Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2024

Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Non-Appearance Case Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/21/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 04/15/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FOR RITE AID CORPORATION AND CERTAIN OF ITS AFFILIATES AND NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; Filed by: THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); As to: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference Set for November 30,2023; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant); As to: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
07/19/2023

DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Deirdre Hill

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Deirdre Hill in Department M Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: PHYLLIS FLEMING, (Plaintiff); As to: RITE AID CORPORATION, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. (Defendant); NICOLE KELLEHER, (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less