This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 18:07:48 (UTC).

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE FUND AND INDEPENDENT AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, VS COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2023 STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A PUBLIC ENTERPRISE FUND AND INDEPENDENT AGENCY OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1111

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND

Defendant

COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLMAN JENNIFER D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/31/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/31/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

01/03/2024

Hearing01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from DOES 1-20 (Defendant), COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant) to Computer Institute of Technology (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- State Compensation Insurance Fund (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California, to State Compensation Insurance Fund

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Computer Institute of Technology (Defendant): Organization Name changed from COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation to Computer Institute of Technology

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Jennifer D. Wellman (Attorney): First Name changed from JENNIFER D to Jennifer; Last Name changed from WELLMAN to Wellman; Organization Name: State Compensation Insurance Fund; Middle Name: D.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketAddress for Jennifer D. Wellman (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant), DOES 1-20 (Defendant) to Computer Institute of Technology (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from DOES 1-20 (Defendant), COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant) to Computer Institute of Technology (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California, (Plaintiff); As to: COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California, (Plaintiff); As to: COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: STATE COMPENSATION INSURANCE FUND, A Public Enterprise Fund and Independent Agency of the State of California, (Plaintiff); As to: COMPUTER INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, a California corporation (Defendant); DOES 1-20 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less