This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 16:42:47 (UTC).

JORGE DOMINGUEZ VS FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 JORGE DOMINGUEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2923

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOMINGUEZ JORGE

Defendant

FCA US LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

VAWTER LAURA D.

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/15/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Demand for Jury Trial

9/15/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

9/15/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/15/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/15/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

10/9/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/19/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

01/22/2024

Hearing01/22/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Date: 09/19/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JORGE DOMINGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less