This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2023 at 12:19:06 (UTC).

ADA VERONICA GOLDSMITH VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 ADA VERONICA GOLDSMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0731

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDSMITH ADA VERONICA

Defendants

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

CITY OF LOS ANGELES PUBLIC WORKS

CITY OF LOS ANGELES SANITATION DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELLOSO DULCE C.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/14/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Settlement

6/1/2023: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

6/2/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/12/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2024
  • Hearing01/02/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/02/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles Sanitation Department (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 51.02; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 75.02; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles Public Works (Defendant); Service Date: 03/17/2023; Service Cost: 51.02; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Sanitation Department (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Sanitation Department (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ada Veronica Goldsmith (Plaintiff); As to: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Sanitation Department (Defendant); City of Los Angeles Public Works (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephen P. Pfahler in Department F49 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less