This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2023 at 06:08:49 (UTC).

RICHARD JONES VS SMART & FINAL STORES, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2023 RICHARD JONES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SMART FINAL STORES, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8719

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES RICHARD

Defendant

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC DBA SMART & FINAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NEIDERMAN JEFF DAVID

Defendant Attorney

COHEN ELLEN E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/8/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/8/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/8/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/8/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/8/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

9/13/2023: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/14/2023

9/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/14/2023

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

9/14/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order (name extension) STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; AND ORDER

10/13/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; AND ORDER

Case Management Statement

10/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/17/2023: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/01/2024

Hearing05/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re Status of Arbitration scheduled for 05/01/2024 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 10/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketUpdated -- STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; AND ORDER: Status Date changed from 10/13/2023 to 10/13/2023 ; Filed By: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant),Richard Jones (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Exact Name: STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; AND ORDER ; Result Date: 10/13/2023 ; Name Extension: blank ; As To Parties: Richard Jones (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023

DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff); Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
08/21/2023

DocketAddress for Jeff D. Neiderman (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Richard Jones (Plaintiff); As to: Smart & Final Stores, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less