This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2023 at 04:11:45 (UTC).

JOSE ROSARIO BELTRAN, ET AL. VS ARMCK ARZROUNIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 JOSE ROSARIO BELTRAN, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARMCK ARZROUNIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1881

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELTRAN JOSE ROSARIO

PEREZ MARIA SOCORRO

RAMIREZ EVELIN

Defendants

ARZROUNIAN ARMCK

ARZROUNIAN GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY MATTHEW K.

 

Court Documents

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

5/25/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/25/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

5/25/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/25/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/25/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2025
  • Hearing05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2024
  • Hearing11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2024
  • Hearing11/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa R. Jaskol in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less