This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2023 at 09:08:21 (UTC).

JOSE ROSARIO BELTRAN, ET AL. VS ARMCK ARZROUNIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 JOSE ROSARIO BELTRAN, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ARMCK ARZROUNIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1881

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BELTRAN JOSE ROSARIO

PEREZ MARIA SOCORRO

RAMIREZ EVELIN

Defendants

ARZROUNIAN ARMCK

ARZROUNIAN GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOY MATTHEW K.

 

Court Documents

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

5/25/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/25/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

5/25/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/25/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/25/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

05/22/2025

Hearing05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2024

Hearing11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/07/2024

Hearing11/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/22/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa R. Jaskol in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jose Rosario Beltran (Plaintiff); Maria Socorro Perez (Plaintiff); Evelin Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Armck Arzrounian (Defendant); George Arzrounian (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less