This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2023 at 01:35:48 (UTC).

JASON ORSATTI, ET AL. VS FCA US LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2023 JASON ORSATTI, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against FCA US LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2737

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUCCIA ANTOINETTE

ORSATTI JASON

Defendants

FCA US LLC

LOS ANGELES CHRYSLER DODGE JEEP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AYVAZIAN SALLY

Defendant Attorney

NYS MARK HUBERT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/20/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/20/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/20/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/20/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/8/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

01/18/2024

Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Los Angeles Motor Cars, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep (Defendant); As to: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep (Defendant); Service Cost: 104.49; Service Date: 10/09/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 38.00; Service Date: 10/04/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketAddress for Sally Ayvazian (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant); Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant); Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jason Orsatti (Plaintiff); Antoinette Cuccia (Plaintiff); As to: FCA US LLC (Defendant); Los Angeles Chrysler Dodge Jeep (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 48 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less