This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2023 at 02:16:27 (UTC).

HOMESITE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/05/2023 HOMESITE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2857

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN FAMILY CONNECT PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

FIRST NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

HOMESITE INSURANCE COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

HOMESITE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE MIDWEST

KEMPER INDEPENDENCE INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY MUTUAL FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

NONPROFIT INSURANCE ALLIANCE OF CALIFORNIA

OHIO SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF ILLINOIS

SPINNAKER INSURANCE COMPANY

TOPA INSURANCE COMPANY

UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY

UNIVERSAL NORTH AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

VIGILANT INSURANCE COMPANY

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYERS DANA

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

6/5/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/5/2023: Complaint

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

6/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 06/13/2023

6/13/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 06/13/2023

Notice (name extension) Notice of Service of Court Order Re Complex Determination

6/20/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Service of Court Order Re Complex Determination

Notice of Related Case

6/20/2023: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

7/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

7/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Notice (name extension) Notice of Adoption/Amendment of Master Complaint (Subrogation Plaintiffs)

7/21/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Adoption/Amendment of Master Complaint (Subrogation Plaintiffs)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

8/21/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

11/16/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Status Conference)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/16/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Status Conference): Status Date changed from 11/16/2023 to 11/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

DocketNotice of Adoption/Amendment of Master Complaint (Subrogation Plaintiffs); Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest (Plaintiff); Homesite Insurance Company of California (Plaintiff); American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vigilant Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Kemper Independence Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Spinnaker Insurance Company (Plaintiff); TOPA Insurance Company (Plaintiff); General Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Plaintiff); Ohio Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Liberty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); First National Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Nonprofit Insurance Alliance of California (Plaintiff); Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Universal North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
06/13/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 12 - Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest (Plaintiff); Homesite Insurance Company of California (Plaintiff); American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vigilant Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Kemper Independence Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Spinnaker Insurance Company (Plaintiff); TOPA Insurance Company (Plaintiff); General Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Plaintiff); Ohio Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Liberty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); First National Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Nonprofit Insurance Alliance of California (Plaintiff); Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Universal North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest (Plaintiff); Homesite Insurance Company of California (Plaintiff); American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vigilant Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Kemper Independence Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Spinnaker Insurance Company (Plaintiff); TOPA Insurance Company (Plaintiff); General Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Plaintiff); Ohio Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Liberty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); First National Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Nonprofit Insurance Alliance of California (Plaintiff); Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Universal North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest (Plaintiff); Homesite Insurance Company of California (Plaintiff); American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Vigilant Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Kemper Independence Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Unitrin Auto and Home Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Spinnaker Insurance Company (Plaintiff); TOPA Insurance Company (Plaintiff); General Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Plaintiff); Ohio Security Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Liberty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); First National Insurance Company of America (Plaintiff); Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Nonprofit Insurance Alliance of California (Plaintiff); Zurich American Insurance Company (Plaintiff); Universal North America Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less