This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/01/2023 at 15:37:15 (UTC).

ALEXIS R. BELL VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 ALEXIS R BELL filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2262

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELL ALEXIS R.

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

JACOBSON KEVIN

VALENCIA JESSE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/24/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/24/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/24/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

6/28/2023: Answer

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/17/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department I at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department I - Hon. Mark H. Epsteineffective 08/21/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- 11/20/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department R to Department I

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); As to: Alexis R. Bell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Alexis R. Bell (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 05/30/2023; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Alexis R. Bell (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Alexis R. Bell (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Alexis R. Bell (Plaintiff); As to: General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less