This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 04:49:09 (UTC).

IVONNE MABEL BENAVIDES VS 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 IVONNE MABEL BENAVIDES filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against 99 CENTS ONLY STORES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1235

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENAVIDES IVONNE MABEL

Defendant

99 CENTS ONLY STORES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRIGHT KENNETH E.

Defendant Attorney

DOLAN MICHAEL ANTHONY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/7/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/7/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/7/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/7/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference

8/7/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/7/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/7/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/3/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

10/24/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/10/2024

Hearing07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff); As to: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketUpdated -- Kenneth E. Wright (Attorney): First Name changed from Mitchell to Kenneth; Last Name changed from Berman to Wright; Middle Name changed from Evan to E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2023

DocketAddress for Kenneth E. Wright (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff); As to: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Date: 08/30/2023; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff); As to: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael Shultz in Department A Compton Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff); As to: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ivonne Mabel Benavides (Plaintiff); As to: 99 Cents Only Stores, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/10/2024 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less