This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2023 at 16:52:53 (UTC).

ERIC VASQUEZ VS CROSSTOWN ELECTRICAL & DATA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2023 ERIC VASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CROSSTOWN ELECTRICAL DATA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7811

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ ERIC

Defendants

ADKINS JUSTIN

CROSSTOWN ELECTRICAL & DATA INC.

HUDSON ERIC

ZEPEDA ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CUMMINGS SCOTT OHARA

FRANCK LEE KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

CATO CHRISTOPHER B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/13/2023: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

11/13/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/27/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/27/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/5/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

9/5/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/16/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/28/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/28/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/28/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/28/2023: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/28/2023

Hearing11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant) et al. As to: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant); Alex Zepeda (Defendant); As to: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant); Alex Zepeda (Defendant); As to: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Justin Adkins (Defendant); Service Cost: 48.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: Eric Hudson (Defendant); Service Cost: 48.00; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
08/03/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eric Vasquez (Plaintiff); As to: CrossTown Electrical & Data, Inc. (Defendant); Justin Adkins (Defendant); Eric Hudson (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less