This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2023 at 14:51:53 (UTC).

GWENDOLYN VANCOTT VS YORK HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2023 GWENDOLYN VANCOTT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YORK HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8518

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GWENDOLYN VANCOTT

Defendants

BOARDWALK WEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

G4 WELLNESS GP LLC

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES

YORK HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

YORK HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEREPINSKIY DMITRIY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/4/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF GWENDOLYN VANCOTT AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

8/4/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF GWENDOLYN VANCOTT AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 377.32

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

8/4/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

8/4/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

 

Docket Entries

08/01/2025

Hearing08/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2025

Hearing01/31/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2025

Hearing01/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gwendolyn Vancott (Plaintiff); As to: York Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); York Healthcare & Wellness Centre (Defendant); G4 Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/17/2025 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/01/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lynne M. Hobbs in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gwendolyn Vancott (Plaintiff); As to: York Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); York Healthcare & Wellness Centre (Defendant); G4 Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gwendolyn Vancott (Plaintiff); As to: York Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); York Healthcare & Wellness Centre (Defendant); G4 Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketDeclaration Declaration of Plaintiff Gwendolyn Vancott as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32; Filed by: Gwendolyn Vancott (Plaintiff); As to: York Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); York Healthcare & Wellness Centre (Defendant); G4 Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less