This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 15:48:12 (UTC).

ERIKA DENISE RODGERS, ET AL. VS SKECHERS, U.S.A., INC. II, , A VIRGINIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2023 ERIKA DENISE RODGERS, filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SKECHERS, U S A , INC II, , A VIRGINIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2335

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RODGERS ERIKA DENISE

RODGERS GARY T. JR.

Defendants

DOES 1 - 50 INCLUSIVE

SKECHERS BY MAIL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SKECHERS U.S.A. INC. II A VIRGINIA CORPORATION

SKECHERS U.S.A. INC.A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SKECHERS USA RETAIL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SKECHERS WAREHOUSE OUTLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STRONGIN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY MANUFACTURING DEFEC 2. STRICT LIABILITY DESIG DEFECT; 3. NEGLIGENCE; 4. NEGLIGENCE FAILURE T RECALL; 5. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILI

7/19/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY MANUFACTURING DEFEC 2. STRICT LIABILITY DESIG DEFECT; 3. NEGLIGENCE; 4. NEGLIGENCE FAILURE T RECALL; 5. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILI

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

7/19/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

7/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET AND CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/19/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

7/19/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN E. WHELAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5.

9/1/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN E. WHELAN PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTIONS 430.41 AND 435.5.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/22/2024

Hearing01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2023

DocketDeclaration of Kevin E. Whelan Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Sections 430.41 and 435.5. Filed by: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc. II, , a Virginia Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc. II, , a Virginia Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 105.20; Service Date: 08/02/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc.a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 45.20; Service Date: 08/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers USA Retail, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 45.20; Service Date: 08/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers Warehouse Outlet (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 45.20; Service Date: 08/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers By Mail, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 45.20; Service Date: 08/10/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketAddress for Eric Strongin (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. STRICT LIABILITY MANUFACTURING DEFEC 2. STRICT LIABILITY DESIG DEFECT; 3. NEGLIGENCE; 4. NEGLIGENCE FAILURE T RECALL; 5. BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY; 6. LOSS OF CONSORTIUM JURY TRIAL DEMANDED -; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc. II, , a Virginia Corporation (Defendant); Skechers By Mail, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Skechers, U.S.A., Inc.a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc. II, , a Virginia Corporation (Defendant); Skechers By Mail, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Skechers, U.S.A., Inc.a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Erika Denise Rodgers (Plaintiff); Gary T. Rodgers, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers, U.S.A., Inc. II, , a Virginia Corporation (Defendant); Skechers By Mail, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Skechers, U.S.A., Inc.a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less