This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 02:10:45 (UTC).

GAGE ALGER, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2023 GAGE ALGER, filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0893

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALGER AARON

CRUZ-LE EVANGELINE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMON JOHN CARL

Defendant Attorneys

FLIGOR CRAIG A.

HUESTON JOHN C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Riley Segal Blackb...)

11/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Riley Segal Blackb...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

10/3/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Gage Alger); Non-A...)

9/13/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Gage Alger); Non-A...)

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account Acknowledgment of Receipt of Order and Funds for Deposit in Blocked Account [Redacted]

9/12/2023: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account Acknowledgment of Receipt of Order and Funds for Deposit in Blocked Account [Redacted]

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

8/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Answer Defendants Southern California Edison Company And Edison International’s Answer To Plaintiffs’ Complaint

7/26/2023: Answer Defendants Southern California Edison Company And Edison International’s Answer To Plaintiffs’ Complaint

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account (as to Gage Alger) [REDACTED]

7/12/2023: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account (as to Gage Alger) [REDACTED]

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellan

7/12/2023: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) (as to Gage Alger) [REDACTED]

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (as to Gage Alger) [REDACTED]

7/7/2023: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim (as to Gage Alger) [REDACTED]

Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice Of Order Re: Petition For Coordination Of Add-On Case

7/3/2023: Notice Re: Add-On Petition (name extension) Notice Of Order Re: Petition For Coordination Of Add-On Case

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

6/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

6/23/2023: Order (name extension) Order Re: Petition for Coordination of Add-On Case

Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition Notice of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International’s Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/8/2023: Notice of Add-on to JCCP Petition Notice of Submission Re: Southern California Edison Company and Edison International’s Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Craig A. Fligor in Support of Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

6/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Re: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

6/6/2023: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP)

Summons Summons on Complaint

6/5/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Riley Segal Blackb...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Further Status Conference [20STCV10176]; Further Status Confe...): Status Date changed from 10/23/2023 to 10/23/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketAcknowledgment of Receipt of Order and Funds for Deposit in Blocked Account [Redacted]; Filed by: Gage Alger (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Gage Alger); Non-A...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Form MC356 (Gage Alger) scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/14/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/23/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 08/21/2023 at 02:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08/22/2023 01:30 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketUpdated -- John C. Hueston (Attorney): Organization Name: Hueston Hennigan, LLP; Middle Name: C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketAddress for John C. Hueston (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
05/26/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 05/25/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gage Alger (Plaintiff); Aaron Alger (Plaintiff); Vivienne Le (Plaintiff); Evangeline Cruz-Le (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gage Alger (Plaintiff); Aaron Alger (Plaintiff); Vivienne Le (Plaintiff); Evangeline Cruz-Le (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less