This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 06:08:06 (UTC).

EVA MYERS VS STATE FARM INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 EVA MYERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STATE FARM INSURANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1622

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYERS EVA

Defendant

STATE FARM INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LUETTO HELEN M.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/26/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/26/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/26/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/26/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/26/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint - COMPLAINT OTHER BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY (NO FRAUD/NEGLIGENCE)

5/26/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT OTHER BREACH OF CONTRACT/WARRANTY (NO FRAUD/NEGLIGENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/28/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HELEN M. LUETTO IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

8/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HELEN M. LUETTO IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2024
  • Hearing02/07/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department C at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2023
  • Hearing09/20/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketNotice Plaintiff opposition to Demurrer of Complaint and request for Amendment of Complaint Breach of Contract; Filed by: Eva Myers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: State Farm Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: State Farm Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Helen M. Luetto in Support of Demurrer of State Farm General Insurance Company; Filed by: State Farm Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/07/2024 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Eva Myers (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Insurance (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketComplaint Other Breach of Contract/Warranty (No fraud/negligence); Filed by: Eva Myers (Plaintiff); As to: State Farm Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/20/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Eva Myers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eva Myers (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less